LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Colorado CO
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB1082
Draft Versions
CO
Colorado House Bill HB1082
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Colorado 2022 Regular Session
Colorado House Bill HB1082
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
June 8, 2022
Fiscal Note
April 6, 2022
Fiscal Note
February 2, 2022
Bill
January 19, 2022
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
March 11, 2022
Compare
Bill
March 4, 2022
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
May 9, 2022
Compare
Amended
Bill
April 22, 2022
Compare
Bill
April 21, 2022
Compare