|
06/02/2022
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
|
05/31/2022
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2022
|
House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2022
|
House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2022
|
House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor
|
|
|