Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1111 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 29, 2022
Fiscal Note March 23, 2022
Fiscal Note February 9, 2022
Bill January 21, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 16, 2022
Bill March 15, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2022

Amended

Bill April 20, 2022
Bill April 19, 2022