06/07/2022 | Governor Signed | |||
06/06/2022 | Sent to the Governor | |||
Senate | 06/06/2022 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 06/03/2022 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 05/10/2022 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | ||
Senate | 05/09/2022 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily | ||
Senate | 05/02/2022 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/29/2022 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee | ||
Senate | 04/29/2022 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 04/28/2022 | Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/25/2022 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy | ||
House | 04/25/2022 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 04/22/2022 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee | ||
House | 04/22/2022 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | House Committee on Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations | ||
House | 01/21/2022 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services |