Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1114 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 11, 2022
Fiscal Note March 29, 2022
Fiscal Note February 11, 2022
Bill January 21, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2022
Bill April 23, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 31, 2022

Amended

Bill May 2, 2022
Bill April 30, 2022