Colorado 2022 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1114 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 07/11/2022

                    Page 1 
July 11, 2022  HB 22-1114  
 
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Final Fiscal Note  
   
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 22-0413  
Rep. Larson; Valdez A. 
Sen. Zenzinger; Kirkmeyer 
  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
July 11, 2022 
Signed into Law 
Erin Reynolds | 303-866-4146 
Erin.Reynolds@state.co.us  
Bill Topic: TRANSPORTATION SERVICES FOR MEDICAID WAIVER RECIPIENTS  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☐ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☐ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill authorizes a transportation network company to provide non-medical 
transportation services to persons enrolled in certain Medicaid waiver programs 
beginning July 1, 2024. It will increase state expenditures on an ongoing basis 
beginning in FY 2022-23. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
For FY 2022-23, the bill requires and includes an appropriation of $547,674 to the 
Department of Health Care Policy and Financing. 
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The final fiscal note reflects the enacted bill.  
 
 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under HB 22-1114 
 
  
Budget Year 
FY 2022-23 
Out Year 
FY 2023-24 
Out Year 
FY 2024-25 
Out Year 
FY 2025-26 
Revenue 
 
-       -       -       -       
Expenditures 	General Fund $88,411  $36,282  $360,000  $720,000  
 	Cash Funds $22,400  $19,833  -  -  
 	Federal Funds $436,863  $344,801  $360,000  $720,000  
 	Total Expenditures $547,674  $400,916  $720,000  $1,440,000  
Transfers  - - - - 
Other Budget Impacts General Fund Reserve $13,262  $5,442  $54,000  $108,000  
 
    Page 2 
July 11, 2022  HB 22-1114  
 
 
Summary of Legislation 
The bill requires the Department of Health Care Policy and Financing (HCPF) to submit a report to the 
legislature by January 2024 identifying ways to incentivize and increase transportation provider 
participation for persons enrolled in the following Medicaid waiver programs: 
 
 the Brain Injury Waiver (BI); 
 the Developmental Disabilities Waiver (DD); 
 the Community Mental Health Supports Waiver (CMHS);  
 the Elderly, Blind and Disabled Waiver (EBD);  
 the Spinal Cord Injury Waiver (SCI); and 
 the Supported Living Services Waiver (SLS).   
  
The report must identify a reimbursement system, compliance procedures, a common reporting 
system, and other best practices, and must be informed by a stakeholder engagement process. 
Following report completion, HCPF must analyze and review each operational transportation 
network company (TNC) and verify its ability to ensure health, safety, welfare, cost effectiveness, and 
capability in expanding non-medical transportation services.   
 
By July 1, 2024, HCPF must authorize verified TNCs to provide services if the TNC is viable under 
federal requirements and within budgetary constraints. HCPF may seek any necessary federal 
authorization and promulgate any necessary rules to ensure compliances with federal and state 
oversight requirements. TNCs are not subject to Public Utilities Commission regulation when 
providing non-medical transportation services. 
Background  
Non-medical transportation (NMT) is a required Medicaid benefit available on all six adult waiver 
programs.  Currently, these transportation services are provided by credentialed drivers, as well as 
taxi services, mobility vans, and public transportation, where available.  Reimbursement for these 
services utilizes fee-for-service, negotiated market price, and public pricing rate methodologies and 
are calculated by multiplying the rate by the number of units utilized. HCPF also oversees the safety 
and oversight of Medicaid NMT services. 
 
TNCs are services that use a digital network to connect riders to drivers for the purpose of providing 
transportation, such as Lyft and Uber. 
Background 
For the BI, CMHS, EBD, and SCI waiver, trips are limited to 208 trips, or 104 round trips, per service 
plan year, excluding trips to and from adult day services.  For the DD and SLS waivers, there is a 
maximum of 508 trips, or 254 round trips, per service plan year.  Most waiver recipients do not fully 
utilize their ride maximums.   
  Page 3 
July 11, 2022  HB 22-1114  
 
 
State Expenditures 
The bill increases state expenditures in HCPF by the amounts shown in Table 2 from the General Fund, 
the Healthcare Affordability and Sustainability Fee Cash Fund, the Children’s Basic Health Plan Trust, 
and federal funds.  These impacts are detailed below.  
 
Table 2 
Expenditures Under HB 22-1114 
 
 	FY 2022-23 FY 2023-24 FY 2024-25 FY 2025-26 
Department of Health Care Policy and Financing 
Contract Business Analyst $201,600  $148,000  	-  -  
Contract Policy Advisor 	$124,230  $26,000  	-  -  
MMIS Programming 	$221,844  $226,916  	-  -  
Service Costs 	-  -  $720,000  $1,440,000  
Total Cost $547,674  $400,916  $720,000  $1,440,000  
General Fund $88,411  $36,282  $360,000  $720,000  
Cash Funds $22,400  $19,833  	-  -  
Federal Funds $436,863  $344,801  $360,000  $720,000  
 
Health Care Policy and Financing.  Costs in HCPF include contract staff, computer programming, 
and increased service costs, as discussed below. 
 
 Staff.  HCPF requires contract support from a business analyst and policy advisor over two years. 
The business analyst will coordinate the systems updates between multiple systems vendors and 
departmental programs. Business analyst costs assume 1,120 hours at $180 per hour in FY 2022-23 
and 800 hours at $185 per hour in FY 2023-24. The policy advisor will identify a reimbursement 
system, a reporting system, compliance procedures, and engage in a stakeholder process, among 
other tasks.  Policy analyst costs assume 615 hours at $202 per hour in FY 2022-23 and 125 hours 
at $208 per hour in FY 2023-24.  Existing department staff will promulgate rules, submit waiver 
amendments, and work with contract staff within existing resources. 
 
 MMIS programming.  Programming costs for the Medicaid Management Information System 
assume 1,596 hours in each of FY 2022-23 and FY 2023-24 at an hourly cost of $139 in FY 2022-23 
and $142 in FY 2023-24.   
 
 Service costs. HCPF data show that there are approximately 3,000 applicable waiver participants 
currently utilizing NMT taxi services at a monthly cost of $200.  The fiscal note assumes a 
20 percent increase in utilization due to the ease and availability of transportation network 
company services.  FY 2024-25 costs reflect one half-year utilization to account for a ramp-up 
period.  
  Page 4 
July 11, 2022  HB 22-1114  
 
 
 
Other Budget Impacts 
General Fund reserve.  Under current law, an amount equal to 15 percent of General Fund 
appropriations must be set aside in the General Fund statutory reserve beginning in FY 2022-23.  Based 
on this fiscal note, the bill is expected to increase the amount of General Fund held in reserve by the 
amounts shown in Table 1, which decreases the amount of General Fund available for other purposes. 
Effective Date 
The bill was signed into law by the Governor on June 7, 2022, and takes effect August 9, 2022, assuming 
no referendum petition is filed. 
State Appropriations 
For FY 2022-23, the bill requires and includes the following appropriations to the Department of 
Health Care Policy and Financing: 
 
 $88,411 from the General Fund; 
 $16,726 from the Healthcare Affordability and Sustainability Fee Cash Fund; 
 $5,674 from the Children’s Basic Health Plan Trust; and 
 $436,863 from federal funds. 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Health Care Policy and Financing  Information Technology 
Law  Regulatory Agencies 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year.  For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit:  leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes.