|
06/02/2022
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
|
05/31/2022
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2022
|
Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2022
|
Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2022
|
Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2022
|
House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2022
|
House Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
House Committee on Health & Insurance Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance
|
|
|