Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1122 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 28, 2022
Bill January 21, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 22, 2022
Bill April 19, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2022

Amended

Bill May 9, 2022
Bill May 7, 2022