Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1150 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 13, 2022
Fiscal Note February 14, 2022
Bill February 4, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 22, 2022
Bill February 18, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 23, 2022

Amended

Bill March 15, 2022
Bill March 12, 2022