Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1202 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 28, 2022
Fiscal Note March 14, 2022
Fiscal Note February 25, 2022
Bill February 7, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 21, 2022
Bill March 18, 2022

Enrolled

Bill April 22, 2022

Amended

Bill April 11, 2022
Bill April 8, 2022