Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1209 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 04/06/2022

                            HOUSE BILL 22-1209
BY REPRESENTATIVE(S) Bradfield and Young, Amabile,
Michaelson Jenet, Pelton, Bird, Bockenfeld, Cutter, Duran, Esgar, Exum,
Froelich, Gray, Herod, Hooton, Jodeh, Kennedy, Lindsay, Lontine,
McCluskie, Titone, Valdez A., Valdez D., Bacon, Benavidez, Bernett,
Gonzales-Gutierrez, Kipp, McCormick, McLachlan, Ricks, Woodrow;
also SENATOR(S) Woodward, Zenzinger.
C
ONCERNING THE CONTINUATION OF THE STRATEGIC ACTION PLANNING
GROUP ON AGING
, AND, IN CONNECTION THEREWITH, IMPLEMENTING
THE RECOMMENDATION CONTAINED IN THE 
2021 SUNSET REPORT BY
THE DEPARTMENT OF REGULATORY AGENCIES TO SUNSET THE
STRATEGIC ACTION PLANNING GROUP ON AGING
.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Colorado:
SECTION 1. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 24-32-3407, amend (2)
as follows:
24-32-3407.  Strategic action plan on aging cash fund. (2)  The
state treasurer may invest any moneys
 MONEY in the fund not expended for
the purpose of this part 34 as provided by law. The state treasurer shall
credit all interest and income derived from the investment and deposit of
NOTE:  This bill has been prepared for the signatures of the appropriate legislative
officers and the Governor.  To determine whether the Governor has signed the bill
or taken other action on it, please consult the legislative status sheet, the legislative
history, or the Session Laws.
________
Capital letters or bold & italic numbers indicate new material added to existing law; dashes
through words or numbers indicate deletions from existing law and such material is not part of
the act. moneys MONEY in the fund to the fund. Any unexpended and unencumbered
moneys MONEY remaining in the fund at the end of a fiscal year remain in
the fund and shall not be credited or transferred to the general fund or
another fund AS OF JUNE 30, 2022, SHALL BE TRANSFERRED TO THE OLDER
COLORADANS CASH FUND , CREATED IN SECTION 26-11-205.5 (5). MONEY
TRANSFERRED TO THE OLDER 
COLORADANS CASH FUND PURSUANT TO THIS
SUBSECTION 
(2) MAY BE USED BY THE DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES FOR
THE 
COLORADO COMMISSION ON AGING TO IMPLEMENT THE
RECOMMENDATIONS MADE BY THE STRATEGIC ACTION PLANNING GROUP ON
AGING
, AS THAT GROUP EXISTED PRIOR TO JULY 1, 2022.
SECTION 2. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 2-3-1203, repeal
(13)(a)(II) as follows:
2-3-1203.  Sunset review of advisory committees - legislative
declaration - definition - repeal. (13) (a)  The following statutory
authorizations for the designated advisory committees are scheduled for
repeal on September 1, 2022:
(II)  The strategic action planning group on aging created in section24-32-3404, C.R.S.;
SECTION 3. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 26-11-101, amend as
amended by House Bill 22-1035 (1)(a) introductory portion as follows:
26-11-101.  Commission on aging - created - definition.
(1) (a)  There is created in the state department the Colorado commission
on aging, referred to in this article 11 as the "commission", for the purpose
of coordinating and guiding the implementation of the strategic action plan
on aging, developed pursuant to section 24-32-3406, 
AS THAT SECTION
EXISTED PRIOR TO 
JUNE 30, 2022, and other strategies the commission may
identify that support older Coloradans. The commission shall consist of
nineteen members who must be appointed as follows:
SECTION 4. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 26-11-102, amend as
amended by House Bill 22-1035 (2)(a) introductory portion as follows:
26-11-102.  Organization of commission. (2) (a)  The commission
may establish standing subcommittees to support the implementation of the
strategic action plan on aging, developed pursuant to section 24-32-3406,
PAGE 2-HOUSE BILL 22-1209 AS THAT SECTION EXISTED PRIOR TO JUNE 30, 2022, and work related to the
lifelong Colorado initiative established in part 3 of this article 11. The
subcommittee topics may include, but are not limited to:
SECTION 5. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 26-11-105, amend as
amended by House Bill 22-1035 (1)(b) and (1)(g) as follows:
26-11-105.  Duties of commission - report. (1)  The commission,
through its executive committee described in section 26-11-102 (1); in
coordination with the state department liaison to the commission, appointed
pursuant to section 26-11-104; and in coordination with independent staff,
contracted pursuant to section 26-11-104, shall carry out the following
duties:
(b)  Coordinate and implement the strategic action plan on aging
recommendations, developed pursuant to section 24-32-3406, 
AS THAT
SECTION EXISTED PRIOR TO 
JUNE 30, 2022, and additional recommendations
the commission makes;
(g)  Review existing policies and programs across state agencies, and
on or before September 1, 2023, and on or before September 1 each year
thereafter, draft an annual report of issues and recommendations developed
by the commission that support the implementation of strategies in
alignment with the strategic action plan on aging developed pursuant to
section 24-32-3406, 
AS THAT SECTION EXISTED PRIOR TO JUNE 30, 2022, the
lifelong Colorado initiative created pursuant to section 26-11-302, and other
recommendations that the commission makes. The commission shall submit
the annual report to the governor, executive directors of impacted agencies,
and the general assembly.
SECTION 6. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 26-11-203, amend as
amended by House Bill 22-1035 (1)(k) and (1)(l) as follows:
26-11-203.  Duties of the state office. (1)  In addition to such other
duties and functions as the executive director may allocate to the state
office, the state office shall have the following duties and functions:
(k)  To convene and coordinate a technical advisory committee
comprised of key state department representatives, including but not limited
to the department of human services, department of labor and employment,
PAGE 3-HOUSE BILL 22-1209 department of higher education, department of health care policy and
financing, department of transportation, department of public health and
environment, and department of local affairs, to direct the implementation
of recommendations and strategies provided in the strategic action plan on
aging developed pursuant to section 24-32-3406, 
AS THAT SECTION EXISTED
PRIOR TO 
JUNE 30, 2022, and recommendations the commission makes as set
forth in section 26-11-105; and
(l)  To coordinate with the technical advisory committee and
commission to develop, maintain, and make publicly available on the state
department's website a collection of available data sets; metrics specific to
the implementation of strategies in alignment with the strategic action plan
on aging developed pursuant to section 24-32-3406, 
AS THAT SECTION
EXISTED PRIOR TO 
JUNE 30, 2022, and the lifelong Colorado initiative
created pursuant to section 26-11-302; and other recommendations that the
commission makes as set forth in section 26-11-105.
SECTION 7. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 26-11-301, amend as
added by House Bill 22-1035 (4) as follows:
26-11-301.  Definitions. As used in this part 3, unless the context
otherwise requires:
(4)  "Strategic action plan on aging" means the strategic action plan
on aging developed pursuant to section 24-32-3406, 
AS THAT SECTION
EXISTED PRIOR TO 
JUNE 30, 2022.
SECTION 8. Effective date. (1)  Except as otherwise provided in
subsection (2) of this section, this act takes effect upon passage.
(2)  Sections 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, and 7 of this act take effect only if House
Bill 22-1035 becomes law, in which case sections 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, and 7 take
effect upon the effective date of this act or the effective date of House Bill
22-1035, whichever is later.
PAGE 4-HOUSE BILL 22-1209 SECTION 9.  Safety clause. The general assembly hereby finds,
determines, and declares that this act is necessary for the immediate
preservation of the public peace, health, or safety.
____________________________ ____________________________
Alec Garnett Steve Fenberg
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE PRESIDENT OF
OF REPRESENTATIVES THE SENATE
____________________________  ____________________________
Robin Jones Cindi L. Markwell
CHIEF CLERK OF THE HOUSE SECRETARY OF
OF REPRESENTATIVES THE SENATE
            APPROVED________________________________________
                                                        (Date and Time)
                              _________________________________________
                             Jared S. Polis
                             GOVERNOR OF THE STATE OF COLORADO
PAGE 5-HOUSE BILL 22-1209