LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Colorado CO
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB1209
Draft Versions
CO
Colorado House Bill HB1209
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Colorado 2022 Regular Session
Colorado House Bill HB1209
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
May 25, 2022
Fiscal Note
March 25, 2022
Fiscal Note
February 24, 2022
Bill
February 8, 2022
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
March 9, 2022
Compare
Bill
March 8, 2022
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
April 6, 2022
Compare
Amended
Bill
March 29, 2022
Compare
Bill
March 28, 2022
Compare