Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1230 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 25, 2022
Fiscal Note May 5, 2022
Fiscal Note February 24, 2022
Bill February 11, 2022

Engrossed

Bill May 4, 2022
Bill May 3, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 13, 2022

Amended

Bill May 10, 2022