Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1237 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 21, 2022
Fiscal Note February 28, 2022
Bill February 15, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 4, 2022
Bill March 3, 2022

Enrolled

Bill April 13, 2022

Amended

Bill April 5, 2022
Bill April 4, 2022