|
05/17/2022
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
|
05/16/2022
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2022
|
Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2022
|
Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2022
|
House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Amended to Finance
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government
|
|
|