Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1242 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 12, 2022
Fiscal Note March 24, 2022
Fiscal Note February 27, 2022
Bill February 17, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2022
Bill April 26, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 16, 2022

Amended

Bill May 9, 2022
Bill May 7, 2022