04/25/2022 | Governor Signed | |||
04/19/2022 | Sent to the Governor | |||
Senate | 04/18/2022 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 04/18/2022 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/01/2022 | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 03/16/2022 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | House Committee on Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations | ||
House | 02/18/2022 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services |