Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1247 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 25, 2022
Fiscal Note February 23, 2022
Bill February 18, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 17, 2022
Bill March 16, 2022

Enrolled

Bill April 13, 2022

Amended

Bill April 4, 2022
Bill April 1, 2022