|
04/07/2022
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
|
04/01/2022
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Unamended to Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs
|
|
|