Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1257 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 7, 2022
Fiscal Note March 2, 2022
Fiscal Note February 24, 2022
Bill February 22, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 4, 2022
Bill March 3, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 31, 2022

Amended

Bill March 21, 2022
Bill March 18, 2022