04/25/2022 | Governor Signed | |||
04/19/2022 | Sent to the Governor | |||
Senate | 04/18/2022 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 04/18/2022 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 03/16/2022 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Water Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 02/24/2022 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Water |