Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1264 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 9, 2022
Fiscal Note March 2, 2022
Bill February 24, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 17, 2022

Enrolled

Bill April 14, 2022

Amended

Bill April 7, 2022
Bill April 6, 2022