Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1276 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 21, 2022
Fiscal Note March 9, 2022
Bill February 28, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 25, 2022
Bill March 22, 2022

Enrolled

Bill April 20, 2022

Amended

Bill April 11, 2022
Bill April 8, 2022