9 | | - | ONCERNING THE CONTINUATION OF THE SECOND CHANCE SCHOLARSHIP |
---|
10 | | - | PROGRAM |
---|
11 | | - | , AND, IN CONNECTION THEREWITH , IMPLEMENTING THE |
---|
12 | | - | RECOMMENDATION CONTAINED IN THE |
---|
13 | | - | 2021 SUNSET REPORT BY THE |
---|
14 | | - | DEPARTMENT OF REGULATORY AGENCIES TO SUNSET THE PROGRAM |
---|
15 | | - | . |
---|
16 | | - | |
---|
17 | | - | Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Colorado: |
---|
18 | | - | SECTION 1. In Colorado Revised Statutes, repeal part 12 of article |
---|
19 | | - | 3.3 of title 23. |
---|
20 | | - | SECTION 2. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 24-34-104, repeal |
---|
21 | | - | (23)(a)(XI) as follows: |
---|
22 | | - | 24-34-104. General assembly review of regulatory agencies and |
---|
23 | | - | functions for repeal, continuation, or reestablishment - legislative |
---|
24 | | - | declaration - repeal. (23) (a) The following agencies, functions, or both, |
---|
25 | | - | NOTE: This bill has been prepared for the signatures of the appropriate legislative |
---|
26 | | - | officers and the Governor. To determine whether the Governor has signed the bill |
---|
27 | | - | or taken other action on it, please consult the legislative status sheet, the legislative |
---|
28 | | - | history, or the Session Laws. |
---|
29 | | - | ________ |
---|
30 | | - | Capital letters or bold & italic numbers indicate new material added to existing law; dashes |
---|
31 | | - | through words or numbers indicate deletions from existing law and such material is not part of |
---|
32 | | - | the act. are scheduled for repeal on September 1, 2022: |
---|
33 | | - | (XI) The Colorado second chance scholarship program created in |
---|
34 | | - | section 23-3.3-1201; |
---|
35 | | - | SECTION 3. Act subject to petition - effective date. This act |
---|
36 | | - | takes effect at 12:01 a.m. on the day following the expiration of the |
---|
37 | | - | ninety-day period after final adjournment of the general assembly; except |
---|
38 | | - | that, if a referendum petition is filed pursuant to section 1 (3) of article V |
---|
39 | | - | of the state constitution against this act or an item, section, or part of this act |
---|
40 | | - | within such period, then the act, item, section, or part will not take effect |
---|
41 | | - | unless approved by the people at the general election to be held in |
---|
42 | | - | PAGE 2-HOUSE BILL 22-1276 November 2022 and, in such case, will take effect on the date of the official |
---|
43 | | - | declaration of the vote thereon by the governor. |
---|
44 | | - | ____________________________ ____________________________ |
---|
45 | | - | Alec Garnett Steve Fenberg |
---|
46 | | - | SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE PRESIDENT OF |
---|
47 | | - | OF REPRESENTATIVES THE SENATE |
---|
48 | | - | ____________________________ ____________________________ |
---|
49 | | - | Robin Jones Cindi L. Markwell |
---|
50 | | - | CHIEF CLERK OF THE HOUSE SECRETARY OF |
---|
51 | | - | OF REPRESENTATIVES THE SENATE |
---|
52 | | - | APPROVED________________________________________ |
---|
53 | | - | (Date and Time) |
---|
54 | | - | _________________________________________ |
---|
55 | | - | Jared S. Polis |
---|
56 | | - | GOVERNOR OF THE STATE OF COLORADO |
---|
57 | | - | PAGE 3-HOUSE BILL 22-1276 |
---|
| 13 | + | ONCERNING THE CONTINUATION OF THE SECOND CHANCE101 |
---|
| 14 | + | SCHOLARSHIP PROGRAM , AND, IN CONNECTION THEREWITH ,102 |
---|
| 15 | + | IMPLEMENTING THE RECOMME NDATION CONTAINED IN THE103 |
---|
| 16 | + | 2021 |
---|
| 17 | + | SUNSET REPORT BY THE DEPARTMENT OF REGULATORY104 |
---|
| 18 | + | AGENCIES TO SUNSET THE PROGRAM .105 |
---|
| 19 | + | Bill Summary |
---|
| 20 | + | (Note: This summary applies to this bill as introduced and does |
---|
| 21 | + | not reflect any amendments that may be subsequently adopted. If this bill |
---|
| 22 | + | passes third reading in the house of introduction, a bill summary that |
---|
| 23 | + | applies to the reengrossed version of this bill will be available at |
---|
| 24 | + | http://leg.colorado.gov/ |
---|
| 25 | + | .) |
---|
| 26 | + | Sunset Process - House Education Committee. The bill |
---|
| 27 | + | implements the recommendation of the department of regulatory agencies |
---|
| 28 | + | SENATE |
---|
| 29 | + | 3rd Reading Unamended |
---|
| 30 | + | April 11, 2022 |
---|
| 31 | + | SENATE |
---|
| 32 | + | 2nd Reading Unamended |
---|
| 33 | + | April 8, 2022 |
---|
| 34 | + | HOUSE |
---|
| 35 | + | 3rd Reading Unamended |
---|
| 36 | + | March 25, 2022 |
---|
| 37 | + | HOUSE |
---|
| 38 | + | 2nd Reading Unamended |
---|
| 39 | + | March 22, 2022 |
---|
| 40 | + | HOUSE SPONSORSHIP |
---|
| 41 | + | Kipp and Exum, Bacon, Benavidez, Bird, Boesenecker, Cutter, Esgar, Jodeh, Lindsay, |
---|
| 42 | + | McCluskie, McCormick, McLachlan, Mullica, Soper, Titone, Woodrow |
---|
| 43 | + | SENATE SPONSORSHIP |
---|
| 44 | + | Moreno, Buckner, Donovan, Fenberg, Ginal, Gonzales, Lee, Smallwood |
---|
| 45 | + | Shading denotes HOUSE amendment. Double underlining denotes SENATE amendment. |
---|
| 46 | + | Capital letters or bold & italic numbers indicate new material to be added to existing statute. |
---|
| 47 | + | Dashes through the words indicate deletions from existing statute. in its sunset review and report on the second chance scholarship program |
---|
| 48 | + | by repealing the program. |
---|
| 49 | + | Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Colorado:1 |
---|
| 50 | + | SECTION 1. In Colorado Revised Statutes, repeal part 12 of2 |
---|
| 51 | + | article 3.3 of title 23.3 |
---|
| 52 | + | SECTION 2. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 24-34-104, repeal4 |
---|
| 53 | + | (23)(a)(XI) as follows:5 |
---|
| 54 | + | 24-34-104. General assembly review of regulatory agencies6 |
---|
| 55 | + | and functions for repeal, continuation, or reestablishment - legislative7 |
---|
| 56 | + | declaration - repeal. (23) (a) The following agencies, functions, or both,8 |
---|
| 57 | + | are scheduled for repeal on September 1, 2022:9 |
---|
| 58 | + | (XI) The Colorado second chance scholarship program created in10 |
---|
| 59 | + | section 23-3.3-1201;11 |
---|
| 60 | + | SECTION 3. Act subject to petition - effective date. This act12 |
---|
| 61 | + | takes effect at 12:01 a.m. on the day following the expiration of the13 |
---|
| 62 | + | ninety-day period after final adjournment of the general assembly; except14 |
---|
| 63 | + | that, if a referendum petition is filed pursuant to section 1 (3) of article V15 |
---|
| 64 | + | of the state constitution against this act or an item, section, or part of this16 |
---|
| 65 | + | act within such period, then the act, item, section, or part will not take17 |
---|
| 66 | + | effect unless approved by the people at the general election to be held in18 |
---|
| 67 | + | November 2022 and, in such case, will take effect on the date of the19 |
---|
| 68 | + | official declaration of the vote thereon by the governor.20 |
---|
| 69 | + | 1276-2- |
---|