05/20/2022 | Governor Signed | |||
05/19/2022 | Sent to the Governor | |||
Senate | 05/19/2022 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 05/19/2022 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 05/10/2022 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | ||
Senate | 05/09/2022 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily | ||
Senate | 05/02/2022 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/29/2022 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor | ||
Senate | 04/28/2022 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/27/2022 | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 04/20/2022 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance | ||
House | 04/18/2022 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 04/14/2022 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee | ||
House | 04/13/2022 | House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government |