Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1301 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 29, 2022
Fiscal Note April 22, 2022
Fiscal Note March 23, 2022
Bill March 15, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 18, 2022
Bill April 14, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 19, 2022

Amended

Bill May 2, 2022
Bill April 30, 2022