Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1328 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 18, 2022
Fiscal Note April 6, 2022
Bill March 28, 2022

Engrossed

Bill May 5, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 25, 2022

Amended

Bill May 10, 2022