Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1339 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 21, 2022
Bill March 28, 2022
Fiscal Note March 28, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 31, 2022
Bill March 30, 2022

Enrolled

Bill April 20, 2022

Amended

Bill April 7, 2022
Bill April 6, 2022