Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1353 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 27, 2022
Fiscal Note April 12, 2022
Bill March 31, 2022

Engrossed

Bill May 2, 2022
Bill April 29, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2022

Amended

Bill May 6, 2022
Bill May 5, 2022