Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1366 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 3, 2022
Fiscal Note April 22, 2022
Fiscal Note April 19, 2022
Bill April 11, 2022

Engrossed

Bill May 2, 2022
Bill April 30, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2022

Amended

Bill May 6, 2022