|
05/18/2022
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
|
05/17/2022
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2022
|
Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2022
|
Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2022
|
Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2022
|
House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2022
|
House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
House Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance
|
|
|