Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1370 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 3, 2022
Fiscal Note April 19, 2022
Bill April 13, 2022

Engrossed

Bill May 2, 2022
Bill April 29, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 17, 2022

Amended

Bill May 10, 2022
Bill May 7, 2022