Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1381 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 20, 2022
Fiscal Note May 10, 2022
Fiscal Note April 20, 2022
Bill April 18, 2022

Engrossed

Bill May 2, 2022
Bill April 30, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 19, 2022

Amended

Bill May 11, 2022
Bill May 10, 2022