|
05/27/2022
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
|
05/17/2022
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2022
|
House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2022
|
House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Water Refer Amended to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Water
|
|
|