Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1382 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 20, 2022
Bill April 18, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2022
Bill April 23, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 16, 2022

Amended

Bill May 4, 2022
Bill May 3, 2022