06/07/2022 | Governor Signed | |||
05/31/2022 | Sent to the Governor | |||
Senate | 05/31/2022 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 05/27/2022 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 05/11/2022 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | ||
Senate | 05/10/2022 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 05/09/2022 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee | ||
Senate | 05/09/2022 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 05/09/2022 | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 05/06/2022 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance | ||
House | 05/06/2022 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 05/05/2022 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor | ||
House | 05/05/2022 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 05/05/2022 | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations | ||
House | 05/04/2022 | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to Finance | ||
House | 04/28/2022 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |