Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1412 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 4, 2022
Fiscal Note April 29, 2022
Bill April 28, 2022

Engrossed

Bill May 6, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 26, 2022

Amended

Bill May 10, 2022