Senate | 03/25/2022 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 03/25/2022 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/11/2022 | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 03/18/2022 - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/11/2022 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to | ||
House | 03/11/2022 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Introduced In House - Assigned to |