Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB004 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 3, 2022
Fiscal Note March 29, 2022
Fiscal Note February 3, 2022
Bill January 12, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 6, 2022
Bill April 5, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 16, 2022

Amended

Bill May 10, 2022
Bill May 5, 2022