Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB006 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note January 25, 2022
Bill January 12, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 14, 2022
Bill March 11, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 11, 2022

Amended

Bill May 9, 2022
Bill May 6, 2022