Colorado 2022 2022 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB021 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 08/04/2022

                    Page 1 
August 4, 2022  SB 22-021  
 
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Final Fiscal Note  
   
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 22-0139  
Sen. Rodriguez; Lee 
Rep. Benavidez; Amabile  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
August 4, 2022 
Signed into Law 
Clare Pramuk | 303-866-2677 
clare.pramuk@state.co.us  
Bill Topic: TREATMENT BEHAVIORAL H EALTH DISORDERS JUSTICE SYSTEM  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☒ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☒ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
This bill extends the Legislative Oversight Committee Concerning the Treatment of 
Persons with Mental Health Disorders in the Criminal and Juvenile Justice Systems and 
the associated task force until July 1, 2027.  It also changes the name and scope of the 
committee and task force to address the treatment of persons with behavioral health 
disorders in the criminal and juvenile justice systems.  It will increase state expenditures 
and potentially state revenue starting in FY 2022-23. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
For FY 2022-23, the bill requires and includes an appropriation of $108,131 to the 
Legislative Department. 
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The fiscal note reflects the enacted bill. 
 
 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under SB 22-021 
 
  
Budget Year 
FY 2022-23 
Out Year 
FY 2023-24 
Revenue 
 
-       	-       
Expenditures 	General Fund $108,131  $101,931  
 	Centrally Appropriated 	$16,575  	$16,575  
 	Total Expenditures $124,706  $118,506  
 	Total FTE 	1.0 FTE 	1.0 FTE 
Transfers  	-       	-       
Other Budget Impacts General Fund Reserve 	$16,220  	$15,290  
 
 
   Page 2 
August 4, 2022  SB 22-021  
 
 
Summary of Legislation 
Under current law, the Legislative Oversight Committee Concerning the Treatment of Persons with 
Mental Health Disorders in the Criminal and Juvenile Justice Systems and its associated task force 
repeal July 1, 2023.  This bill: 
 
 renames the oversight committee as the Legislative Oversight Committee Concerning the 
Treatment of Persons with Behavioral Health Disorders in the Criminal and Juvenile Justice 
Systems; extends the committee and task force until July 1, 2027;  
 changes the scope of the committee and task force to address the treatment of persons with 
behavioral health disorders in the criminal and juvenile justice systems; and  
 reduces the size of the task force from 32 to 31.  
 
Legislative Council Staff and the Office of Legislative Legal Services are required to supply staff 
assistance to the oversight committee within existing appropriations.  The Legislative Council Staff is 
also required to provide staff assistance to the task force within existing appropriations.  If existing 
appropriations are not adequate to supply staff assistance, the Director of Legislative Council is 
required to request additional funding through the annual budget process.  
 
Oversight committee. The oversight committee is required to meet at least three times per year and 
provide oversight to the task force.  Each oversight committee member is required to attend or call 
into at least one regular task force meeting.  The oversight committee is required to submit an annual 
report to the General Assembly by January 15 of each year, including recommended legislation 
resulting from the work of the task force.  Oversight committee members may receive per diem and 
reimbursement for expenses. The oversight committee may request legislative changes that are 
treated as interim committee bills.   
 
Task force. The task force is required to meet at least six times per year and provide annual 
recommendations on policy and legislation to the oversight committee by August 1 each year.  
Seventeen members of the task force from local agencies and the public may receive reimbursement 
for expenses by the Legislative Council.  Any state department or agency that is represented on the 
task force may receive and expend gifts, grants, and donations, for deposit into the newly created 
Treatment of Persons with Behavioral Health Disorders in the Criminal and Juvenile Justice Systems 
Fund (cash fund).  Among its new duties, the task force must provide evidence-based feedback, or 
indicate a lack of evidence, on the potential benefits or consequences of a legislative or other policy 
proposal, within two weeks of the request. 
State Revenue 
The bill potentially increases state cash fund revenue from gifts, grants, and donations.  No source of 
gifts, grants, or donations has been identified at this time. These funds are not subject to TABOR.  
   Page 3 
August 4, 2022  SB 22-021  
 
 
State Expenditures 
The bill increases General Fund expenditures by $124,706 in FY 2022-23 and $118,506 in FY 2023-24 
for the Legislative Department. The bill requires the Office of Legislative Council Staff and the Office 
of Legislative Legal Services to provide staff within existing appropriations; however, there are no 
existing appropriations available to implement the bill.  New costs are shown in Table 2 and explained 
below. 
 
Table 2 
Expenditures Under SB 22-021 
 
Cost Components 	FY 2022-23 FY 2023-24 
Legislative Department             
Personal Services 	$71,040 $71,040 
Operating Expenses 	$1,350      $1,350       
Capital Outlay Costs 	$6,200       	-       
Member Travel and Per Diem 	$4,245 	$4,245 
Task Force Member Reimbursement 	$25,296 $25,296 
Centrally Appropriated Costs
1
 	$16,575     $16,575          
Total $124,706  $118,506  
Total FTE 1.0 FTE 1.0 FTE 
1
 Centrally appropriated costs are not included in the bill's appropriation. 
 
Legislative Department.  The standard costs for Legislative Council Staff and the Office of Legislative 
Legal Services to staff an interim committee includes 0.3 FTE of a researcher, 0.1 FTE of an attorney, 
and 0.1 FTE of a legislative editor.  In addition, providing staff support to the task force is expected to 
require 0.5 FTE of a researcher to staff monthly meetings, conduct research, and prepare reports, at a 
cost of approximately $41,000 per year. Standard operating expenses and capital outlay costs are 
included.  Because staff are part-time, the General Fund pay date shift has not been applied. 
 
 Member and task force reimbursements.  Reimbursement for oversight committee members 
assumes three meetings with per diem of $111.82 and $124.00 travel for six legislative members.  
Expense reimbursement for 17 eligible task force members is based on the required twelve 
meetings per year at $124.00 per member. 
 
Other participating agencies. A number of agencies are required to participate in the task force.  
These agencies can accomplish this increased workload within existing appropriations.   
 
Centrally appropriated costs. Pursuant to a Joint Budget Committee policy, certain costs associated 
with this bill are addressed through the annual budget process and centrally appropriated in the Long 
Bill or supplemental appropriations bills, rather than in this bill.  These costs, which include employee 
insurance and supplemental employee retirement payments, are shown in Table 2.  Page 4 
August 4, 2022  SB 22-021  
 
 
Other Budget Impacts 
General Fund reserve.  Under current law, an amount equal to 15 percent of General Fund 
appropriations must be set aside in the General Fund statutory reserve beginning in FY 2022-23.  Based 
on this fiscal note, the bill is expected to increase the amount of General Fund held in reserve by the 
amounts shown in Table 1, which will decrease the amount of General Fund available for other 
purposes. 
Local Government  
Representatives of local governments and agencies who are appointed to the task force will have an 
increase in workload and are eligible for expense reimbursement.   
Effective Date 
The bill was signed into law by the Governor and took effect on June 8, 2022. 
State Appropriations 
For FY 2022-23, the bill requires and includes a General Fund appropriation of $108,131 to the 
Legislative Department including: 
 
 $60,255 to Legislative Council Staff; 
 $18,335 to the Office of Legislative Legal Services; and  
 $29,541 to the General Assembly. 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Alternate Defense Counsel  Corrections  
Education  Health Care Policy and Financing  
Human Services Labor  
Law  Legislative Council  
Child's Representative  Legislative Legal Services 
Public Safety  
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year.  For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit:  leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes.