Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB021 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note August 4, 2022
Fiscal Note January 13, 2022
Bill January 12, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 14, 2022
Bill March 11, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 17, 2022

Amended

Bill May 2, 2022
Bill April 29, 2022