Page 1 May 31, 2022 SB 22-042 Legislative Council Staff Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature Final Fiscal Note Drafting Number: Prime Sponsors: LLS 22-0028 Sen. Coram Rep. Esgar; Will Date: Bill Status: Fiscal Analyst: May 31, 2022 Signed into Law Clare Pramuk | 303-866-2677 clare.pramuk@state.co.us Bill Topic: COLORADO STATE FAIR AUTHORITY BOARD MEMBERSHIP Summary of Fiscal Impact: ☐ State Revenue ☒ State Expenditure ☐ State Transfer ☐ TABOR Refund ☐ Local Government ☐ Statutory Public Entity The bill restructures the Board of Commissioners of the Colorado State Fair Authority but does not change the size or responsibilities of the board. It increases state workload in FY 2022-23 only. Appropriation Summary: No appropriation is required. Fiscal Note Status: The fiscal note reflects the reenacted bill. Summary of Legislation Senate Bill 22-013, signed into law on February 25, 2022, increased the size of the Board of Commissioners of the State Fair Authority from eleven to thirteen members, including the Commissioner of Agriculture or the Commissioner’s designee, two residents from the county where the state fair is held (Pueblo County), one resident from each of the eight congressional districts, and two residents from the state at large. SB22-013 added an at-large member and a member from the new eighth congressional district. Instead of members from each of the eight congressional districts, this bill requires two members from each of the four agricultural districts in the state. On October 31, 2022, the Governor must appoint two members from the state at large. When a current member’s term expires or a vacancy otherwise occurs, the Governor must appoint members according to the requirements included in the bill. The bill also sets requirements for members regarding occupation, agricultural experience, residency, and political party affiliation. The requirements included in this bill supersede the requirements in SB22-013. State Expenditures The bill increases workload for the Office of the Governor to incorporate the new requirements. This can be accomplished within existing appropriations. Page 2 May 31, 2022 SB 22-042 Effective Date The bill was signed into law by the Governor on March 24, 2022, and takes effect August 9, 2022, assuming no referendum petition is filed. State and Local Government Contacts Agriculture Governor Information Technology The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each fiscal year. For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit: leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes.