Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB042 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 31, 2022
Fiscal Note March 4, 2022
Fiscal Note January 28, 2022
Bill January 14, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 24, 2022
Bill February 23, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 15, 2022

Amended

Bill March 11, 2022
Bill March 10, 2022