Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB042 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 03/15/2022

                            SENATE BILL 22-042
BY SENATOR(S) Coram, Bridges, Buckner, Cooke, Gonzales, Hisey,
Kirkmeyer, Priola, Rankin, Scott, Simpson, Smallwood, Sonnenberg,
Woodward;
also REPRESENTATIVE(S) Esgar and Will, Bernett, Bockenfeld, Exum,
Gray, Hooton, Lindsay, Pelton, Pico, Ricks, Roberts, Snyder.
C
ONCERNING CHANGES TO THE MEMBERSHIP OF THE BOARD OF
COMMISSIONERS OF THE 
COLORADO STATE FAIR AUTHORITY .
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Colorado:
SECTION 1. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 35-65-401, amend (2),
(3), (4), (5), and (8.5) as follows:
35-65-401.  Colorado state fair authority - creation - board -
powers and duties - repeal. (2) (a)  On June 30, 1997, the existing board
of commissioners of the Colorado state fair authority is abolished, and the
terms of the members of the board then serving are terminated.
(b)  There is hereby created the board of commissioners of the
Colorado state fair authority, which shall have eleven HAS THIRTEEN
members, ten TWELVE of whom shall be appointed by the governor with the
NOTE:  This bill has been prepared for the signatures of the appropriate legislative
officers and the Governor.  To determine whether the Governor has signed the bill
or taken other action on it, please consult the legislative status sheet, the legislative
history, or the Session Laws.
________
Capital letters or bold & italic numbers indicate new material added to existing law; dashes
through words or numbers indicate deletions from existing law and such material is not part of
the act. consent of the senate and one who shall be IS the commissioner of
agriculture or his or her THE COMMISSIONER'S designee. At no time shall
BEFORE OCTOBER 31, 2022, NO more than six members of the board MAY
be affiliated with the same political party as the governor. Within thirty days
after June 30, 1997, the governor shall appoint the initial members of the
board. The governor may appoint, as a member of the board, any person
who was a member of the board prior to its termination.
(c) (I)  ON OCTOBER 31, 2022, THE GOVERNOR SHALL APPOINT TWO
BOARD MEMBERS FROM THE STATE AT LARGE IN ACCORDANCE WITH
SUBSECTION
 (3)(b) OF THIS SECTION. MEMBERS APPOINTED BEFORE THE
EFFECTIVE DATE OF THIS SUBSECTION
 (2)(c)(I) TO REPRESENT THE
CONGRESSIONAL DISTRICTS AND THE STATE AT LARGE MAY HOLD OFFICE FOR
THE REMAINDER OF THE TERM TO WHICH EACH MEMBER WAS APPOINTED
.
W
HEN A MEMBER'S TERM EXPIRES OR A VACANCY OTHERWISE OCCURS , THE
GOVERNOR SHALL APPOINT A NEW MEMBER IN ACCOR DANCE WITH THE
REQUIREMENTS OF SUBSECTION
 (3) OF THIS SECTION.
(II)  T
HIS SUBSECTION (2)(c) IS REPEALED, EFFECTIVE DECEMBER 31,
2026.
(3)  Of the ten appointed
 THE GOVERNOR SHALL APPOINT THE
FOLLOWING TWELVE
 members of the board:
(a)  Two shall be
 residents of the county in which the Colorado state
fair and industrial exposition is held; and
(b)  TWO MEMBERS FROM THE STATE AT LARGE ; AND
(c)  Of the remaining eight members, at least one shall be a resident
of each of the congressional TWO RESIDENTS FROM EACH OF THE FOUR
AGRICULTURAL
 districts of the state, and at least two shall be residents ofthe western slope of the state AS DEFINED IN SECTION 35-1-105 (1)(c).
(4)  Of the members first appointed to the board, two members
representing congressional districts shall be appointed for terms expiring
November 1, 1998; two members representing congressional districts shall
be appointed for terms expiring November 1, 1999; one member
representing a congressional district, one member representing the county
in which the Colorado state fair and industrial exposition is held, and one
PAGE 2-SENATE BILL 22-042 at-large member shall be appointed for terms expiring November 1, 2000;
one member representing a congressional district, one at-large member, and
one member representing the county in which the Colorado state fair and
industrial exposition is held shall be appointed for terms expiring November
1, 2011. Thereafter, Members of the board shall be appointed for terms of
four years; 
EXCEPT THAT THE TERMS SHALL BE STAGGERED SO THAT NO
MORE THAN THREE MEMBERS
' TERMS EXPIRE IN THE SAME YEAR .
Appointments made to the board when the senate is not in session shall be
ARE temporary appointments, and the appointees shall serve on a temporary
basis until the senate is in session and is able to confirm such appointments.
I
F THE SENATE DOES NOT CONFIRM A TEMPORARY APPOINTMENT DURING THE
NEXT REGULAR SESSION
, THE TEMPORARY APPOINTEE'S TERM ENDS AND THE
PERSON SHALL NOT BE REAPPOINTED AS A TEMPORARY APPOINTEE DURING
THE SUBSEQUENT LEGISLATIVE INTERIM
. Each member shall hold office
until the member's successor is appointed and qualified.
(5) (a)  Of the ten
 TWELVE appointed members of the board:
(I)  one shall be a certified public accountant, one shall have
expertise in finance through current management-level experience in
banking, and one shall have substantial experience in agriculture or in the
activities of 4-H clubs FOUR MUST BE INVOLVED IN THE AGRICULTURAL
INDUSTRY
;
(II)  A
T LEAST THREE MUST BE AFFILIATED WITH EACH MAJOR
POLITICAL PARTY FOR AT LEAST ONE YEAR PRIOR TO APPOINTMENT
, AS
SHOWN IN THE STATEWIDE VOTER REGISTRATION SYSTEM
; AND
(III)   AT LEAST THREE MUST BE UNAFFILIATED FOR AT LEAST ONE
YEAR PRIOR TO APPOINTMENT
, AS SHOWN IN THE STATEWIDE VOTER
REGISTRATION SYSTEM
.
(b)  I
N MAKING APPOINTMENTS, THE GOVERNOR SHALL ATTEMPT TO
ENSURE THAT THE BOARD REPRESENTS THE GEOGRAPHIC DIVERSITY OF THE
STATE
.
(8.5)  All eleven
 THIRTEEN members of the board, including the
commissioner of agriculture or his or her designee, shall be voting members
of the board. The members of the board shall elect a chair, a vice-chair, and
a secretary from among the membership of the board. Board action shall
PAGE 3-SENATE BILL 22-042 require the affirmative vote of a majority of a quorum of the board.
SECTION 2. Act subject to petition - effective date. This act
takes effect at 12:01 a.m. on the day following the expiration of the
ninety-day period after final adjournment of the general assembly; except
that, if a referendum petition is filed pursuant to section 1 (3) of article V
of the state constitution against this act or an item, section, or part of this act
within such period, then the act, item, section, or part will not take effect
unless approved by the people at the general election to be held in
PAGE 4-SENATE BILL 22-042 November 2022 and, in such case, will take effect on the date of the official
declaration of the vote thereon by the governor.
____________________________  ____________________________
Steve Fenberg Alec Garnett
PRESIDENT OF SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
THE SENATE OF REPRESENTATIVES
____________________________  ____________________________
Cindi L. Markwell Robin Jones
SECRETARY OF CHIEF CLERK OF THE HOUSE
THE SENATE OF REPRESENTATIVES
            APPROVED________________________________________
                                                        (Date and Time)
                              _________________________________________
                             Jared S. Polis
                             GOVERNOR OF THE STATE OF COLORADO
PAGE 5-SENATE BILL 22-042