03/24/2022 | Governor Signed | |||
03/18/2022 | Sent to the Governor | |||
House | 03/18/2022 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee | ||
House | 03/04/2022 | House Committee on Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/14/2022 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |