LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Colorado CO
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB052
Draft Versions
CO
Colorado Senate Bill SB052
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Colorado 2022 Regular Session
Colorado Senate Bill SB052
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
May 24, 2022
Fiscal Note
February 25, 2022
Fiscal Note
February 2, 2022
Bill
January 18, 2022
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
February 15, 2022
Compare
Bill
February 14, 2022
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
March 11, 2022
Compare
Amended
Bill
March 9, 2022
Compare
Bill
March 8, 2022
Compare