05/31/2022 | Governor Signed | |||
05/11/2022 | Sent to the Governor | |||
House | 05/10/2022 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 05/10/2022 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 05/02/2022 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 04/29/2022 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 04/29/2022 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 04/26/2022 | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations | ||
House | 04/20/2022 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 04/20/2022 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/19/2022 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee | ||
Senate | 04/19/2022 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 02/24/2022 | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |