Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB099 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 11, 2022
Fiscal Note April 25, 2022
Fiscal Note April 11, 2022
Fiscal Note February 23, 2022
Bill February 1, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 20, 2022
Bill April 19, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 10, 2022

Amended

Bill May 2, 2022
Bill April 30, 2022