|
06/08/2022
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
|
05/25/2022
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Water Refer Amended to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2022
|
Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Water
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2022
|
Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources
|
|
|